HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLE OF WIGHT COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Mission is to increase the charitable funding that is available to voluntary organisations and community groups active in Hampshire and the Isle of Wight. We provide efficient donor and grant making services, which are open, accessible, and user friendly. We build a bridge between people who care about their local community and the wide range of voluntary and community groups needing help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,015,328
Donations and legacies | £609.16k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £406.17k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,826,728
Raising funds | £72.00k | |
Charitable activities | £1.75m | |
Other | £0 |
£954,798 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £72.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.75m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £72.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.75m | |
Retained for future use | £143.40k |
People

8 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
Governance
- 15 October 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Rachel Cooper FCA | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Amelia Sophie Riviere DL | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew York | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Stanley | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wood | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Cheyney | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Prideaux | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Simon Cleverly | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Hensman | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Smith | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Krysia Butwilowska | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sukanya Sitaram | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Councillor Dan Putty JP | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Andrew Joy | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jo Ash CBE | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £801.46k | £4.75m | £1.60m | £2.44m | £1.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £974.55k | £2.66m | £2.23m | £2.25m | £1.83m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.93k | £465.28k | £575.25k | £427.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £344.46k | £4.32m | £1.20m | £2.02m | £609.16k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £51.63k | £1.49m | £286.49k | £672.85k | £233.34k | |
|
Income - Investment | £457.00k | £431.46k | £401.65k | £425.29k | £406.17k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £872.18k | £2.54m | £2.12m | £2.12m | £1.75m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £102.37k | £120.86k | £104.66k | £130.91k | £72.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.43k | £42.25k | £20.19k | £25.10k | £28.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £671.60k | £2.30m | £1.81m | £1.91m | £1.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £32.73k | £28.84k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £14.50m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £12.99m | £14.49m | £1.61m | £13.42m | £14.25m | |
|
Other assets | £920.77k | £1.96m | £1.88m | £2.63m | £1.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £98.80k | £31.75k | £43.23k | £38.73k | £24.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTIES OF HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLE OF WIGHT AND UNITARY AUTHORITIES OF SOUTHAMPTON AND PORTSMOUTH AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING THOSE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE, THE ISLE OF WIGHT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Linked charities
- 15 October 1981 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
BVA
The Orchard
White Hart Lane
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG21 4AF
- Phone:
- 01962 798700
- Email:
- info@hiwcf.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window