Trustees REVELATION FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1100573

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GORDON PETTIE | Chair | 01 January 2004 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR SCOTT | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Samuek Jayarajasinghan Jayakrishna | Trustee | 27 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN CONDER | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
LORNA PETTIE | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR ODELL | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.