MEXBOROUGH COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
**IN LIQUIDATION** IN GENERAL THE REGENERATION OF MEXBOROUGH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Doncaster
Governance
- 04 November 2003: Standard registration
- MCP LTD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ken Barron | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jill Jevons | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN CHURCHILL DUTTON | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN AGAR | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Lampitt | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.48k | £815 | £10.82k | £14.61k | £15.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.05k | £12.48k | £28.00k | £19.29k | £38.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | £4.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION, AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE MEXBOROUGH AREA OF THE COUNTY OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE, AS DEFINED BY THE BOUNDARIES SET BY DONCASTER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH COUNCIL BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 3.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT 3.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE 3.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES 3.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE OF FAVOURABLE TERMS 3.6 THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING 3.7 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES 3.8 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE 3.9 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES 3.10 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT 3.11 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE 3.12 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME 3.13 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE,MEXBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
GIBSON BOOTH B S & I LTD
15 VICTORIA ROAD
BARNSLEY
S70 2BB
- Phone:
- 01226 215999
- Email:
- AW@GIBSONBOOTHINSOL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window