Accounts and annual returns THE WILSON CENTRE (LONG NEWTON)

Charity Number: 1111182
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 30 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required