WEST YORKSHIRE LEARNING CONSORTIUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The West Yorkshire Learning Consortium is a Voluntary and Community Sector (VCS) organisation that works in partnership and collaboration with all of the key infrastructure organisations in the sub-region and the districts - the WYLC also works collaboratively and in partnership with VCS colleagues regionally and nationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 04 November 2003: Standard registration
- 20 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- W.Y.L.C. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.33k | £146.25k | £322.94k | £243.93k | £311 | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.94k | £223.87k | £327.18k | £319.46k | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 31 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 30 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 11TH DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 12TH NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO: 3.1.1 PROVIDE A FORUM FOR COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN INVOLVED IN EDUCATION AND LEARNING TO ENCOURAGE COMMUNICATION, NETWORKING, INFORMATION SHARING AND REPRESENTATION; 3.1.2 DEVELOP A PARTNERSHIP APPROACH TO ENCOURAGE COLLABORATION BETWEEN COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION ON ISSUES OF LEARNING AN SKILLS DEVELOPMENT; 3.1.3 FACILITATE DIALOGUE BETWEEN COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE WEST YORKSHIRE LEARNING AND SKILLS COUNCIL AND THE FIVE LOCAL LEARNING PARTNERSHIPS IN WEST YORKSHIRE AND OTHER STATUTORY AGENCIES AND ORGANISATIONS INTERESTED IN ISSUES OF LEARNING AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING RELATIONS AND COMMUNICATION; 3.1.4 CARRY OUT ANY ASSOCIATION ACTIVITIES WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALL TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE WEST YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window