Accounts and annual returns WHITBY AND DISTRICT LOBSTER POT NURSERY AND CRECHE

Charity Number: 1100966
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 02 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 05 July 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 24 June 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 03 July 2008 On Time