Financial history WHITBY AND DISTRICT LOBSTER POT NURSERY AND CRECHE

Charity number: 1100966
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £27.19k £51.26k £93.54k £78.44k £93.25k
Total expenditure £33.57k £56.93k £71.22k £83.28k £90.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A