Accounts and annual returns THE UGANDAN EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101224
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2012 25 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 05 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 17 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2010 24 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 09 February 2011 On Time