BRIDGEWATER CARE (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bridgewater Care is involved in rehabilitation training in China for community-based rehab and hospital rehab. Projects include wheelchair donations in conjunction with the Disabled People's Federation and local community offices for poor, disabled individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- China
Governance
- 08 December 2003: Standard registration
- 02 July 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.57k | £8.58k | £2.97k | £1.82k | £135 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £8.03k | £1.03k | £0 | £3.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 17 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 01 May 2012 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 18 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH MAY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISABILITY IN CHINA
Area of benefit
CHINA, OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window