IPSWICH DIAL-A-RIDE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 November 2003: Standard registration
- 26 March 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 26 March 2008: Funds transferred to 1062038 SUFFOLK ACRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 18 April 2006 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 23 June 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 13TH AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF IPSWICH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
IPSWICH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window