Accounts and annual returns SHERBURN ROAD COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1103402
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 14 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 14 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 13 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 30 September 2008 On Time