SHERBURN ROAD COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To empower the residents of the Pelaw & Gilesgte Ward, Durham, to develop personally and collectively; through the provision of services and opportunities for learning and for managing their own community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 26 April 2004: Standard registration
- 11 January 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SRCAP LTD (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.52k | £142.55k | £138.66k | £112.98k | £44.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.64k | £163.20k | £161.22k | £145.60k | £91.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 14 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 14 August 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 13 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 30 September 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PELAW WARD IN THE CITY DISTRICT OF DURHAM (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND IN PARTICULAR: A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING FACILITIES TO ENABLE RESIDENTS TO ACQUIRE SKILLS WHICH WOULD ASSIST THEM IN OBTAINING PAID OR BETTER PAID EMPLOYMENT. B) TO GENERALLY IMPROVE THE HEALTH OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND TRAINING ON MATTERS RELATING TO THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH. C) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF LOCAL COMMUNITIES (BOTH GEOGRAPHICALLY AND COMMUNITIES OF INTEREST) IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND DEAL WITH MATTERS THAT EFFECT THEM AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF STRUCTURES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR ABILITY TO COOPERATE WITH EACH OTHER AND TO ENGAGE WITH ORGANISATIONS IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
THE PELAW WARD IN THE CITY DISTRICT OF DURHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window