BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA DIASPORA

Charity number: 1101912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides advocacy/advice/information Acts as umbrella or resource body

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,793
Total expenditure: £3,940

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Remzudin Alihodzic Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
ZAIM PASIC Trustee
BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA U.K. NETWORK
Received: On time
BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA COMMUNITY ADVICE CENTRE
Received: On time
Dr ZDENKA BESARA Trustee
BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA U.K. NETWORK
Received: On time
BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION COVENTRY
Received: 8 days late
Dr ANES CERIC Trustee
THE BIRMINGHAM BOSNIA HERZEGOVINA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £1.82k £9.77k £8.79k
Total expenditure £0 £5 £1.45k £3.07k £3.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 February 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bosnia House
639-641
Stratford Road
Birmingham
B11 4EA
Phone:
01217723052
Website:

No information available