Financial history FRIENDS OF ABBEYDALE PICTURE HOUSE

Charity number: 1101215
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2007 31/05/2008 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2011
Total gross income £66.70k £85.02k £59.96k £87.48k £44.87k
Total expenditure £57.44k £78.89k £59.57k £52.95k £33.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A