TEACHER SUPPORT CYMRU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to help teachers by providing a variety of services to improve teacher wellbeing and effectiveness in Wales, including: A bilingual website: www.teachersupportcymru.info Bilingual onling coaching in Welsh and English Free confidential counselling 24/7 Free advice and information and money advice 24/7 including support with budgeting, debts and benefits and grants and loans
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 18 November 2003: Standard registration
- 06 December 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 06 December 2012: Funds transferred to 1072583 TEACHER SUPPORT NETWORK
- TEACHERS SUPPORT CYMRU (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £311.12k | £155.35k | £157.13k | £103.90k | £84.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £310.52k | £155.46k | £156.86k | £93.86k | £101.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 17 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 30 August 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 27 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 20 July 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 22 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 21 July 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 19 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 21 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 17 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE THE INFIRMITIES OF OLD AGE AND THE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISABILITY OF SERVING, FORMER AND RETIRED TEACHERS, INCLUDING FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATION TEACHERS, THEIR WIDOWS/WIDOWERS AND/OR DEPENDANTS, PROVIDED THAT ANYONE OTHERWISE FALLING WITHIN ANY OF THESE CATEGORIES MUST ALSO RESIDE OR TEACH IN WALES ("THE BENEFICIARIES") B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window