Financial history S.O.C.K.S.

Charity number: 1100762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £2.58k £357 £726 £1.96k £1.33k
Total expenditure £1.98k £460 £445 £168 £323
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A