HILLSTOWN COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of the community in the local government district of Bolsover. To work with local groups and other partners to promote and extend sports and recreational activities in order to increase health and education. To promote the maintenance and improvement of local community facilities and surrounding environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 26 April 2004: Standard registration
- 02 October 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 02 October 2009: Funds transferred to 520546 HILLSTOWN MINERS' WELFARE TRUST
- H.C.A.G. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.91k | £20.48k | £24.38k | £3.11k | £3.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69k | £23.45k | £17.87k | £6.18k | £3.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 18 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 09 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 04 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 15 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 15 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 17 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | 26 July 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 5 FEBRUARY 2004, 28 JULY 2004, 25 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF BOLSOVER AND , IN PARTICULAR HILLSTOWN, SCARCLIFFE, PALTERTON AND BOLSOVER. B) TO WORK WITH LOCAL GROUPS AND OTHER PARTNERS TO PROMOTE AND EXTEND SPORTS AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, IN ORDER TO INCREASE HEALTH AND EDUCATION OPPORTUNITIES. C) TO PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF LOCAL COMMUNITY FACILITIES, AND THE SURROUNDING ENVIRONMENT, IN LINE WITH THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF BOLSOVER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window