BURY LAKE YOUNG MARINERS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bury Lake Young Mariners is committed to the development of young people through the medium of sailing and other water based sports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
48 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
Governance
- 18 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Northwood | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Bhavesh Chauhan | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hallett | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bennett | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Ridout | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andre Marc Roy | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anne MacManus | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Ronald Talbot | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Elliott Colston | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Constable | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Parks | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.03k | £165.24k | £229.94k | £232.00k | £200.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.03k | £97.61k | £136.66k | £150.09k | £165.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.27k | £18.65k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 JANUARY 2003 AND 12 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ORGANISE, PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITY AND YOUTH GROUPS IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA TO SAIL OR PLAY OTHER GAMES AND SPORTS AND THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS, AND WITH A VIEW OF FURTHERING THE ABOVE OBJECTS: (I) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SAILING, GAMES OR SPORTS EQUIPMENT OF EVERY KIND FOR THE USE OF SUCH PUPILS AS AFORESAID (II) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF COURSES, LECTURES, DEMONSTRATIONS AND COACHING FOR PUPILS OF SCHOOLS AND THE UNIVERSITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO PROVIDE THE SAME FOR TEACHERS WHO ORGANISE OR SUPERVISE SAILING, PLAYING AND COACHING OF SAILING AND OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS AT SUCH SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES AS AFORESAID (III) TO PLAN, LAY OUT, MANGE, EQUIP, MAINTAIN OR ASSIST IN THE PLANNING, LAYING OUT, MANAGING, EQUIPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF APPROPRIATE ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER FACILITIES TO BE USED FOR THE TEACHING AND LEARNING OF SAILING OR THE TEACHING AND PLAYING OF OTHER SPORTS AND GAMES BY SUCH PUPILS AS AFORESAID. (B) TO ORGANISE, PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION OR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR BOYS AND GIRLS UNDER THE AGE OF 24 YEARS AND WHO, BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Boathouse Rickmansworth
Frogmoor lane
Rickmansworth
WD3 1NB
- Phone:
- 01923 772015
- Email:
- cosec@blym.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window