GRAND UNION VILLAGE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Grand Union Village Community Development Trust aims to create a sustainable and inclusive community for those living and working in the Village and surrounding areas, through working with residents, statutory, voluntary and community groups in supporting economic, recreational and environmental initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 27 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN KNIGHTS | Chair | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
NIRUPA KUKAPALAN | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN MIREMBE | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
RABIH HAMZE | Trustee | 07 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Lynne Henriquez-Foster | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sara White | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Karen Pennie | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.26k | £42.68k | £47.02k | £45.98k | £68.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.92k | £28.99k | £36.62k | £59.93k | £73.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 March 2021 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 March 2021 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 2ND SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PURSUE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE, PRIMARILY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AND IN PARTICULAR 3.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES 3.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION 3.4 TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT 3.5 TO IMPROVE HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OR IN SUCH MANNER AS IS CHARITABLE (PROVIDE THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODY OF A STATUARY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING) AND TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE HOUSING FOR THOSE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES 3.6 TO RELIEVE POVERTY
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF HILLINGDON AND EALING, GRAND UNION CANAL KNOWN AS GRAND UNION VILLAGE AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Development Trust
6 Higham Mews
NORTHOLT
UB5 6FP
- Phone:
- 02088458518
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window