SOCIETY OF SAINT GREGORY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society promotes, enhences and deepens the understanding and practice of the worship of the Roman Catholic Church. It does this by publishing an quarterly journal, 'Music and Liturgy', and by organising a Summer School and occasional other events. Membership of the Society is open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 April 2004: Standard registration
- SSG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fr Adrian Benedict Porter | Chair | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Price | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Yvonne Jones | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jonathan Elliott | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Kevin McCabe | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lamb | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Shepherd | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Griffiths | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Catherine Ryan | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.69k | £39.98k | £54.10k | £18.97k | £25.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.40k | £48.28k | £53.83k | £19.00k | £24.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 290 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 290 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE STUDY, UNDERSTANDING AND GOOD PRACTICE IN THE CELEBRATION OF THE LITURGY OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF THE CHURCH. THE SOCIETY AIMS TO ACHIEVE THIS OBJECT BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS, BROADLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY EXPRESSED AS FOLLOWS: (I) BY FURTHERING THE STUDY AND UNDERSTANDING BY THE PEOPLE OF THE LITURGY OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH, WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING THEIR ACTIVE PARTNERSHIP THEREIN; (II) BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE LITURGY AND SACRED MUSIC; (III) BY ORGANISING MEETINGS, SCHOOLS AND CONFERENCES WHICH INSTRUCTION IN THE LITURGY AND MUSIC GIVEN; (IV) BY PRODUCING, PRINTING, PUBLISHING AND MAKING AVAILABLE BOOKS, PERIODICALS, MUSIC, RECORDINGS, AND OTHER MATERIAL LIKELY TO BE REQUIRED BY PERSONS CONCERNED WITH THE LITURGY AND SACRED MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Lauriston Street
EDINBURGH
EH3 9DJ
- Phone:
- 07517 416 466
- Email:
- chairman@ssg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window