NORTHUMBERLAND GREYHOUND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Adoption/Rehoming/Public Awareness of ex racing Greyhounds that have been retired from UK (northeast) tracks due to age, injury or inability
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 16 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Ashworth | Chair | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Gibbinson | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA PILE | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
julie james | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
anne-marie ebdon | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
GWEN LOWERY | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
hazel beck | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
nigel davison | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.08k | £10.78k | £29.27k | £151.06k | £74.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.37k | £13.69k | £26.56k | £44.88k | £65.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2013
Charitable objects
1. THE RESCUE, CARE AND SHELTER OF UNWANTED FORMER RACING GREYHOUNDS AND IN PARTICULAR UNREGISTERED DOGS IN THE COUNTIES OF NORTHUMBERLAND AND TYNE AND WEAR, WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM NEGLECT OR ILL TREATMENT IN ANY FORM AND TO FIND SUITABLE NEW HOMES FOR SUCH ANIMALS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HUSBANDRY AND CARE OF FORMER RACING GREYHOUNDS
Area of benefit
NORTHUMBERLAND AND TYNE AND WEAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O 31 Belsay Grove
BEDLINGTON
NE22 5YU
- Phone:
- 07947588633
- Website:
-
northumberlandgreyhoundrescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window