BERNADETTE TYNAN FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the natural gifts in every child with grants to families/individuals in need and educational training/research. Information and advice for individuals and educational establishments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 November 2003: Standard registration
- 21 June 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BEAUTIFUL MINDS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.05k | £2.30k | £2.27k | £845 | £132 | |
|
Total expenditure | £872 | £2.22k | £1.12k | £180 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 29 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 19 August 2011 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 22 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 24 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 5 FEBRUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
A) CONDUCT, PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE BEST EDUCATIONAL AND NURTURING TECHNIQUES FOR CHILDREN WITH A VIEW TO MAXIMISING THE INHERENT POTENTIAL OF EACH CHILD, AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; AND B) CONDUCT, PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE FACTORS WHICH CONTRIBUTE TO THE ACHIEVEMENT OF OUTSTANDING PERFORMANCE BY INDIVIDUALS IN ALL FIELDS, AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; AND C) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ADVANTAGES TO THE PUBLIC AND SOCIETY OF PROMOTING AND APPLYING THE BEST EDUCATIONAL AND NURTURING TECHNIQUES FOR CHILDREN SO AS TO MAXIMISE THE INHERENT POTENTIAL OF EACH CHILD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window