Trustees ROYAL FLYING DOCTOR SERVICE OF AUSTRALIA, FRIENDS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Charity number: 1101004

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER BOX | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emma Louise Buchanan | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bronte Louise Somes | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Niki Lee Waters | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Flynn Baird | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Hawkins | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hawkins | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meredith Ann Ridgway | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Coventry | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mulley | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Elsie Miles | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Thompson | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Ruth Dudley | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
David John Nelligan | Trustee | 28 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.