Accounts and annual returns THE PETTIFOR TRUST CORPORATION

Charity number: 1106097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 11 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 24 July 2024 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 24 July 2024 85 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 June 2023 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 27 June 2023 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 July 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 05 July 2022 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 June 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 June 2021 56 days late Download Open in new window