THE VINEY HILL CHRISTIAN ADVENTURE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Residential and camping centre offering outdoor pursuits and adventure activities for groups. We provide the ideal venue for your group to relax, study and discover the great outdoors through adventurous and challenging activities in a supportive Christian environment. Working to encourage and inspire personal, social and spiritual development through the creative use of outdoor pursuits
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 30 March 2004: Standard registration
- 17 January 2023: Funds received from 702516 THE WOOLHOPE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Rt Revd Robert Wilfred Springett | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Carole Ann O'Donnell | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Lucy Marshall | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Benjamin Preece Smith | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Hilary Dawson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Roland Peter Bott | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev JO WETHERALL | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Stephen Longton | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Barry Stevens | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
MICHAEL WYATT | Trustee | 20 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
SIMON ANDREW MOORE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £406.97k | £264.03k | £394.72k | £394.64k | £489.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £390.56k | £253.80k | £369.48k | £390.94k | £465.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 FEBRUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED 2. TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY AND THOSE FROM DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED 3. TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER 4. TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF SUNDAY SCHOOLS, CLASSES, SEMINARS, LECTURES CONFERENCES AND OTHERWISE 5. TO PROVIDE SUCH AMENITIES AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS ARE NOT PROVIDED FROM PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
VINEY HILL, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD VICARAGE
VINEY HILL
LYDNEY
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL15 4NA
- Phone:
- 01594516162
- Email:
- info@vineyhilladventure.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window