VULCAN TO THE SKY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Honouring the Past, Inspiring the Future - To preserve Avro Vulcan XH558 and return other aircraft and engineering artefacts of significant heritage interest to working order and to demonstrate them.To advance the inspiration and education of the public in aviation and engineering heritage and technical knowledge by providing access to engineering demonstrations and other practical activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 February 2004: Standard registration
- VTS (Working name)
- VULCAN TO THE SKY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Edward Lawson Jarron | Chair |
|
||||||
Steven John Roberts | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Cooper | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip Spiers | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR STEPHEN LIDDLE CENG MRAES | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NICHOLAS SHARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR GERALD HOWARTH MP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD CLARKE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £775.51k | £2.35m | £1.03m | £726.62k | £469.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £923.20k | £1.42m | £1.13m | £1.11m | £822.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £22.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £295.33k | £2.06m | £798.12k | £434.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £421.43k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £58.53k | £4.15k | £49.85k | £64.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £231 | £195 | £106 | £212 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £282.33k | £184.68k | £226.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.69k | £0 | £140.64k | £6.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £386.67k | £216.62k | £253.95k | £315.38k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £536.53k | £1.20m | £796.35k | £780.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £39.75k | £33.76k | £45.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £82.14k | £17.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/05/2014 as amended on 24 Jul 2018 as amended on 02 Dec 2020 as amended on 18 Oct 2024 as amended on 20 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
1) To preserve and protect Avro Vulcan XH558 and return her to full working order for the benefit of the public and to demonstrate and display her to the public and to conserve and return to full working order other aircraft and engineering artefacts in general which are of significant heritage interest and to maintain such in a purpose-built facility. 2) To advance the education of the general public in Avro Vulcan XH558, in aviation and engineering heritage, in its associated provenance, historical and social context and in the strategy of deterrence, for the benefit of British heritage, and historical knowledge. 3) To advance the education of the general public in Avro Vulcan XH558 and other aircraft and engineering artefacts in general of significant heritage interest, in their design, engineering and technologies, operational and maintenance processes and procedures; for the benefit of British heritage, and technical knowledge and conservation, by providing access to engineering demonstrations and practical activities. 4) To advance the education of the general public in the causes of climate change, in particular by aviation, and in the solutions being devised to mitigate these causes, by providing explanations and demonstrations. 5) To advance the education of the general public in the subjects of science, technology, engineering and mathematics (‘STEM’ subjects).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vulcan to the Sky Trust
Unit 4
Delta Court
Sky Business Park
Auckley
DONCASTE
- Phone:
- 01302 802077
- Email:
- enquiries@vulcantothesky.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window