THE BLUE FLASH MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, WORKSHOPS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOSEPH MITCHELSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT MAYFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98k | £1.85k | £2.17k | £1.81k | £2.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.91k | £1.26k | £2.80k | £1.97k | £1.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1197 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1562 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 07 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, WORKSHOPS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30a East Street
HORSHAM
RH12 1HL
- Phone:
- 01403267270
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window