P.O.A
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 2004: Standard registration
- 21 June 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 June 2007: Funds transferred to 1117527 POA WELFARE FUND
- POA WELFARE FUND (Working name)
- PRISON OFFICERS ASSOCIATION WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.46k | £126.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.51k | £77.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 12 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 12 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 21 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 21 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED 25 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, POST OR PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE PRISON OFFICERS' ASSOCIATION, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS; 2) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT..
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window