RUGBY FAMILY HISTORY GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family History research, presentations, tuition and supporting others involved in the activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 16 December 2003: Standard registration
- 26 February 2018: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- RFHG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.55k | £4.27k | £3.91k | £3.63k | £3.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.14k | £4.72k | £3.69k | £3.58k | £4.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 15 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 06 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 02 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 27 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 1 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY, GENEALOGY, HERALDRY AND LOCAL HISTORY IN RELATION TO THE TOWN OF RUGBY AND ITS ENVIRONS AND TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, SECURITY, COLLATION AND DISSEMINATION OF ARCHIVAL MATERIAL
Area of benefit
RUGBY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window