FOUNDATIONS INDEPENDENT LIVING TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Foundations Independent Living Trust works with older adults and disabled people to thrive and remain living independently in their own homes, linking with our partnerships with Home Improvement Agencies we offer access to grant funding to help with gas safe and warm home initiatives and sign posting to other support services available in local communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Winstanley | Chair | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nick Huston | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Trigg | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £380.01k | £337.10k | £489.07k | £493.90k | £373.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £417.79k | £333.11k | £415.93k | £453.82k | £457.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18 NOVEMBER 2002, AS AMENDED 6 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED, PARTICULARLY THE ELDERLY, DISABLED OR UNEMPLOYED, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HOME IMPROVEMENTS AND REPAIRS IN ORDER FOR SUCH PERSONS TO CONTINUE TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY IN THEIR HOMES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
22 Norfolk Street
GLOSSOP
Derbyshire
SK13 8BS
- Phone:
- 0300 124 0316
- Email:
- info@filt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window