Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF NEWNHAM INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1101999
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 August 2024 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 August 2024 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 November 2023 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 19 November 2023 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 November 2022 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 October 2019 On Time Download Open in new window