FRIENDS OF NEWNHAM INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of F.O.N.I.S.A. are to generate funds to donate to Newnham Infant and Nursery School for specific projects. These funds are generated by selling uniform and by holding various fundraising events during the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 10 February 2004: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 May 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Aitken | Chair | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHLOE ROBAK | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Browne | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.75k | £15.32k | £23.98k | £32.15k | £38.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.91k | £6.96k | £10.56k | £13.47k | £29.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 November 2023 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 November 2023 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 November 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 26 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF NEWHAM INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NEWHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
FONISA
Newnham Infant & Nursery School
Newnham Avenue
Ruislip
Middlesex
HA4 9RW
- Phone:
- 020 3745 6215
- Email:
- fonisainfo@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window