SAUSAGE TREE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of educational resources for two schools in Luangwa Valley, Zambia. Provision of grants for buildings that enhance the schools facilities eg teachers houses, classrooms. Grants given to school and college students paying teachers salaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Zambia
Governance
- 25 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUCINDA CHIGNELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KYLIE HAYCOCK | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MORRISON | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM CHIGNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.35k | £33.45k | £50.40k | £55.06k | £46.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.35k | £13.25k | £20.76k | £63.34k | £66.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 9 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND, IN PARTICULAR; (A) THE PROVISION AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, MATERIALS, TEACHERS AND ACCOMMODATION FOR TEACHERS; AND (B) THE CREATION OF AND FUNDING OF SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS AND PRIZES TO BE AWARDED TO SCHOOL CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merryview
Merryfield Road
Monkwood
ALRESFORD
Hampshire
SO24 0HE
- Phone:
- 07703112615
- Email:
- sausagetreecharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.