WORD FOUNTAIN CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity in the year under review is that of advancing the Christian faith and relief for persons in condition of need, hardship or distress by demonstrating the love and power of Jesus Christ through: outreach, relevant practical helps, bible teaching, worship and fellowship. We also work with youths and children through mentoring and leadership development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 February 2004: Standard registration
- WFCM (Working name)
- WORD FOUNTAIN CHURCH (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof John Folorunso Durodola | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Rae Ross | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAY ADEPEGBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Modupe Oluwatoyin Adefala | Trustee |
|
||||||
OLABODE ADEDAYO ADEFALA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.55k | £73.35k | £78.97k | £89.71k | £94.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.98k | £52.41k | £78.76k | £79.38k | £82.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH THE PLANNING AND ESTABLISHMENT OF NEW CHURCH GROUPS, CHRISTIAN MISSION WORK AND EVANGELISM. 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS ASSOCIATED WITH MAJOR CHANGES IN A PERSONAL LIFE SUCH AS, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, HOMELESSNESS, BEREAVEMENT AND UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SEE FIT. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL CLASSES AND SEMINARS TO ASSIST THEM WITH THEIR STUDIES OF THE NATIONAL CURRICULUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Word Fountain Christian Ministries
Rear Hall
73 Hollow Way
Cowley
OXFORD
OX4 2ND
- Phone:
- 01865402108
- Email:
- pastor@wordfountain.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window