SIERRA LEONE SOCIETY (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We conduct fundraising events on behalf of organisations in the Sierra Leonean community. We donate funds to organisations such as hospitals, churches, hospices and schools in order to enrich the standard and quality of life for fellow Sierra Leoneans
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Haringey
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 14 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Gowdie | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Caroline Tipson | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rosalina Frazer | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/02/2020 | 14/02/2021 | 14/02/2022 | 14/02/2023 | 14/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.34k | £3.63k | £3.34k | £3.73k | £5.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.18k | £226 | £3.19k | £2.92k | £5.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 February 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SUCH CHARITABLE PROJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, PRIMARILY BY NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE PROJECTS THAT ARE AIMED AT SUPPORTING PEOPLE IN NEED, WHO LIVE IN SIERRA LEONE. 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR SIERRA LEONEANS, LIVING IN TOTTENHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA. IN PARTICULAR TO ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SIERRA LEON AND TOTTENHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Ivatt Way
LONDON
N17 6PF
- Phone:
- 07521924783
- Email:
- sierraleonesociety@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window