FREE FOR ALL COMMUNITY RECYCLING LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
recycling and the promotion and education of reuse of waste materials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 27 January 2004: Standard registration
- FREE FOR ALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Frederic Graham | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE SCOTT | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL SCOTT | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATH GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.48k | £21.23k | £14.60k | £12.70k | £12.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.39k | £7.87k | £12.58k | £14.45k | £10.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.83k | £2.60k | £600 | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 NOVEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO CONSERVATION AND SUSTAINABILITY (SUSTAINABILITY MEANS AS DEFINED BY THE BRUNDTLAND COMMISSION'S DEFINITIONS WHICH IS "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IS THAT WHICH NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR NEEDS.") 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN RESPECT OF THE ENVIRONMENTAL ASPECTS AND NEED FOR RECYCLING IN THE COMMUNITY. 3) TO ACQUIRE LAND AND PROPERTY FOR AND TO CREATE A DOORSTEP GREEN ON LAND AT LONGTHWAITE ROAD, WIGTON, CUMBRIA ("THE GREEN") UNDER THE AUSPICES OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AGENCY'S DOORSTEP GREEN INITIATIVE AND THEREAFTER TO HOLD AND MAINTAIN THE GREEN AS AN AREA OF OPEN SPACE FOR THE BENEFIT AND USE WITH OUT CHARGE OF INHABITANTS OF AND VISITORS TO THE LOCALITY IN WHICH THE GREEN IS SITUATE FOR INFORMAL RECREATION, PLAY, OTHER LEISURE TIME PURSUITS COMMUNITY EVENTS AND ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE OF BENEFIT TO SUCH INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 WEST STREET
WIGTON
CA7 9NP
- Phone:
- 07504929313
- Email:
- ddennisgraham@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window