Financial history BRITISH DEAF HISTORY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1110669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.18k £131.42k £86.47k £98.50k £74.43k
Total expenditure £59.40k £243.65k £128.94k £54.65k £95.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £43.36k N/A