FRIENDS OF LOIS WEEDON CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain, restore and repair the fabric, grounds, graves, graveyard, boundary walls and gates of the Church of St Mary & St Peter, Lois Weedon with Weston and Plumpton, Northamptonshire. To restore, repair and maintain the fixtures, fittings and furnishings of the church. To improve the fabric, fixtures, fittings, furnishings, grounds, graves, graveyard, boundary walls & gates of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 05 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lady Susan Margaret Greenaway | Chair | 01 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Teresa Tyler | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr C I Atkins | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DEWAR GETLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JAMES CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.16k | £2.93k | £5.39k | £5.53k | £11.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120 | £3.80k | £141 | £121 | £8.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
A) TO MAINTAIN RESTORE AND REPAIR THE FABRIC GROUNDS GRAVES GRAVEYARD BOUNDARY WALLS AND GATES OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY AND ST. PETER LOIS WEEDON WITH WESTON AND PLUMPTON NORTHAMPTONSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHURCH") B) TO RESTORE REPAIR AND MAINTAIN THE FIXTURES FITTINGS AND FURNISHINGS OF THE CHURCH C) TO IMPROVE THE FABRIC FIXTURES FITTINGS FURNISHINGS GROUNDS GRAVES GRAVEYARD BOUNDARY WALLS AND GATES OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
LOIS WEEDON WITH WESTON AND PLUMPTON, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOIS WEEDON HOUSE
LOIS WEEDON
TOWCESTER
NN12 8PJ
- Phone:
- 01327860472
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window