FULCRUM-ANGLICAN

Charity Number: 1102069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of spiritual renewal within the Church of England.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £1,118
Total expenditure: £1,497

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 February 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Revd Alastair Murray Cutting Trustee 01 January 2011
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
ACG LIMITED
Received: 56 days late
Rev JAMES MERCER Trustee
None on record
DR ELAINE STORKEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.04k £1.03k £1.17k £1.12k £1.12k
Total expenditure £2.07k £565 £1.06k £1.50k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 21 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 06 August 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
All Saints Vicarage
Elm Grove Road
London
W5 3JH
Phone:
07946333958