THE THREE R'S EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide basic education in the tribal areas in rural India. Financial assistance to cover salaries in single teacher schools in rural areas, and for those institutions and establishments to enable them to improve the basic education and health care provision in rural areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- India
- Kenya
- Nepal
Governance
- 07 April 2004: Standard registration
- SARASWATI VIDYALAYA TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phool Kumari | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Mary Katherine Bernadette McGowan | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MR J SANGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR S THAKRAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NATHU RAM PURI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.98k | £40.62k | £1.08k | £929 | £70 | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.80k | £139.33k | £50 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR OR TOWARDS THE FOLLOWING WITHIN INDIA AND ELSEWHERE:- 1. TO PROVIDE BASIC EDUCATION IN THE ADIVASI AREAS (UNDER-DEVELOPED TRIBAL AND OR HILL AREAS, WITH REMOTE ACCESS PROBLEMS AND LITERACY LEVELS OF LESS THAN 30%) IN RURAL INDIA ESPECIALLY BY PROVIDING PRE-EDUCATION FACILITIES BASED ON SINGLE TEACHER SCHOOLS, WHERE EMPHASIS WILL BE GIVEN TO ARITHMETIC, HYGIENE READING AND WRITING; 2. TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL HELP TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THOSE INSTITUTIONS/ESTABLISHMENTS WHOSE MAIN AIMS ARE TO PROVIDE BASIC EDUCATION AND/OR HEALTH CARE PROVISION IN THE UNDER DEVELOPED AREAS OF INDIA; 3. TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THOSE WHO WISH TO BECOME PART/FULL TIME VOLUNTEER TEACHERS TO DO SO; 4. TO RELIEVE PERSONS, WHO ARE RESIDENT OF THE ADIVASI/ TRIBAL AREAS OF INDIA AND ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; 5. FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT OR EXTRA FACILITIES IN ANY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION OR ESTABLISHMENT, OR ESTABLISHMENT OF A NEW INSTITUTION TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES, IN CASE OF SPECIAL NEED IN AREAS WHERE LITERACY LEVEL IS LESS THAN 30% AND PROVISION OF ANY HELP IN THE RUNNING AND FURTHER DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH AN INSTITUTION. 6. THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT FOR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY, OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS; 7. TO EDUCATE, TO RELIEVE YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT MAINLY WITHIN THE DEPRIVED AND OR ADIVASI/TRIBAL AREAS OF INDIA WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED AND UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT OR TO FURTHER THEIR FORMAL EDUCATION BY PROVIDING FOR SUCH PERSONS WORKSHOPS AND SUCH OTHER TRAINING FACILITIES AS WILL ENABLE THEM TO OBTAIN WORK EXPERIENCE AND ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS; 8. TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE RELIEVE OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
WITHIN INDIA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
365 PLAINS ROAD
MAPPERLEY
NOTTINGHAM
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG3 5RS
- Phone:
- 01159013000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window