WILLINGTON COURT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charitable company was that of letting it's freehold property to other charitable organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 05 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Pattison | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Marcel Jung | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
DARREN ANDREW EAGLES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.18k | £76.02k | £85.17k | £92.38k | £92.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.78k | £50.14k | £63.46k | £81.17k | £134.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 APRIL 2002, AS AMENDED 19 JUNE 2004 AND 26 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROVIDING MEETING ROOMS, LECTURE HALLS, ACCOMMODATION AND RELATED FACILITIES, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHRISTIAN STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Harrow Way
Weavering
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME14 5TU
- Phone:
- 01622804664
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window