Trustees JURASSIC COAST TRUST

Charity number: 1101134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fritha Costain Trustee 06 February 2023
DORSET & SOUTH WILTSHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING
Received: On time
Jonathan Larwood Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
Sarah Philbrick Trustee 17 July 2017
None on record
Mark Bermingham Trustee 16 July 2017
None on record
John Wokersien Trustee 27 February 2015
None on record
STUART HUGHES Trustee
None on record