SOUTH MITCHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Cafe, Pre-School Playgroup, Children and Young peoples activities, Arts & Crafting projects, Tap, Ballet, Asian Dancing, Sports, Yoga, Karate, Pilates, Zumba, Digital classes, Gardening sessions, Lunch Clubs, Worship (several denominations), Evening Social activities, Family events, Off site trips, English Language Support classes, Games and Social club, Health awareness sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £44,228 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Merton
Governance
- 22 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc Clifford | Chair | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muhammed Yahya | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sasha Lindsay | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Walker | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kemi Oyebode | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Phillips | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA EDNA HOLGATE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.82k | £52.71k | £94.65k | £154.19k | £161.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.10k | £66.01k | £72.84k | £193.19k | £243.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.60k | £41.21k | £41.83k | £42.88k | £44.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 03 APR 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH MITCHAM AND THE LOCAL AREA WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH INHABITANTS 3.2 TO MANAGE PREMISES AT COBHAM COURT FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE COMPANY AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES
Area of benefit
MITCHAM, MERTON, GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
COBHAM COURT
HASLEMERE AVENUE
MITCHAM
SURREY
CR4 3PR
- Phone:
- 02086483740
- Email:
- sarah@smca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window