Accounts and annual returns YARLINGTON HOUSING GROUP

Charity number: 1108793
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 June 2018 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 June 2018 125 days late
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 29 September 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 12 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 24 July 2015 On Time