Governing document YARLINGTON HOUSING GROUP
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/04/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/11/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/12/2011
Charitable objects
(I) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (WHETHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) AND THE INFIRMITIES ASSOCIATED WITH OLD AGE BY THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING, OTHER HOUSING AND APPROPRIATE FACILITIES AND AMENITIES; AND (II) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A COMPANY REGISTERED AS A NON-PROFIT PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WITH THE REGULATOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE SOMERSET, DORSET, DEVON, WILTSHIRE AND CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.