MONEY MOUNTAIN (BBC RADIO DERBY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The majority of the money is raised by a charity auction of goods and services donated by companies, organisations and individuals. The auction is broadcast by BBC Radio Derby. Groups and individuals also organise fundraising events and donate funds to the appeal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottinghamshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 13 April 2004: Standard registration
- 05 January 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.05k | £39.55k | £25.65k | £23.09k | £23.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.41k | £42.64k | £24.69k | £27.32k | £23.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 29 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 29 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 31 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 30 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 30 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 19 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 19 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 12 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 12 January 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 23 OCTOBER 2003 AMENDED 17 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS IN THE COUNTIES OF DERBYSHIRE, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, LEICESTERSHIRE,STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE CITY OF DERBY AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
DERBYSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE, LEICESTERSHIRE AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window