ARYA VEDIC SOCIETY LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities Arts/culture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2019
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAGHUBIR SAIN BERRY MBE | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2015 | 30/10/2016 | 30/10/2017 | 30/10/2018 | 30/10/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £2.20k | £2.48k | £2.12k | £1.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £565 | £1.46k | £1.64k | £648 | £476 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 255 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 255 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 621 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 621 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 986 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 986 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1351 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1351 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1716 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED 4 JANUARY 2004 AND 7 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE VEDIC DHARMA (RELIGION) AND TO PROMOTE THE CULTURAL, AND SPIRITUAL AND EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY. (II) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE COMMUNITY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF CENTRES AND THE PROVISION OF CLASSES IN HINDI AND SANSKRIT LANGUAGES, YOGA AND IT, A LIBRARY INCLUDING THE PROVISION AND PUBLICATION OF PERIODICALS AND REFERENCE MATERIALS ON THE VEDIC RELIGION. (IV) TO PUBLISH PERIODICAL AND OTHER LITERATURE FOR THE PROPAGATION AND OF VEDIC TEACHINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 LAMBOURNE ROAD
BIRSTALL
LEICESTER
LE4 4FX
- Phone:
- 07765650328
- Email:
- hemangb@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window