Financial history XLP

Charity number: 1101095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.84m £2.04m £2.32m £2.44m £2.47m
Total expenditure £1.49m £1.50m £1.94m £2.44m £2.83m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £496.10k £294.20k £189.63k £446.13k £383.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.81m £1.92m £2.29m £2.40m £2.37m
Income - Other trading activities £22.03k £42.04k £26.37k £41.96k £37.74k
Income - Charitable activities £8.18k £615 £3.27k £236 £1.13k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28 £6 £0 £0 £12.17k
Income - Other £0 £84.21k £0 £0 £47.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £2.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.38m £1.40m £1.83m £2.27m £2.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £114.47k £101.15k £111.07k £161.88k £178.74k
Expenditure - Governance £33.53k £33.21k £32.77k £55.24k £61.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0