THEATRE FOR A CHANGE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HEALTH AND EDUCATION OF MARGINALISED COMMUNITIES IN THE UK AND ABROAD BY THE USE OF PERFORMING ARTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £222,110 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
- Malawi
Governance
- 21 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay Chaston | Chair | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Rae | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Bardelli Danieli | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Misomali | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teohna Williams | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Gerald Roger Bates | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Marguerite Millward | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE MONTGOMERY | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Harris | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £708.84k | £873.76k | £1.07m | £879.22k | £415.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £843.16k | £747.64k | £899.56k | £905.99k | £631.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £492.03k | £10.00k | £506.08k | £481.27k | £222.11k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £667.60k | £867.79k | £1.00m | £845.09k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £41.24k | £5.97k | £63.08k | £34.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £808.41k | £736.05k | £887.26k | £891.58k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £34.75k | £11.60k | £12.30k | £14.41k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.78k | £0 | £18.52k | £20.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £570.54k | £0 | £620.17k | £609.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 3 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
1. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN AFRICA USING THE ARTS AS A MEDIUM OF COMMUNICATION, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC; AND 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Bowling Green Lane
LONDON
EC1R 0NE
- Phone:
- 02036331382
- Email:
- fiona.morrell@tfacafrica.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window