Financial history FLEXSYS COMMUNITY HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1103035
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £172.69k £138.36k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £178.81k £147.36k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0